LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB173
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB173
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB173
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/01/2025
8:00 am
Higher Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.036
HB173
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB184
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
HB484
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
HB678
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1211
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB1507
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB1705
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1868
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB2290
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2851
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB2856
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB3041
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB3204
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16