Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1486 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 1774 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#490 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#449 | Journal Page: 1717 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably with amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 545 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
House | 01/06/2025 | Filed |