Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1782 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .