Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1846 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/23/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Walle, Lujan H.B. No. 1846




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Electric Truck Advisory
 Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 201, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter H-2 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H-2. ELECTRIC TRUCK ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 201.681.  DEFINITIONS.  In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Council" means the Electric Truck Advisory
 Council established by this subchapter.
 (2)  "Electric truck" includes any electric vehicle
 with a gross vehicle weight rating of 8,501 pounds or more.
 Sec. 201.682.  ESTABLISHMENT; COMPOSITION.  (a)  The
 Electric Truck Advisory Council is established.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), the council is composed of:
 (1)  at least one representative appointed by each of
 the following agencies and entities:
 (A)  the governor's office;
 (B)  the department;
 (C)  the Public Utility Commission of Texas;
 (D)  the Electric Reliability Council of Texas;
 (E)  the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality;
 (F)  the Texas Department of Licensing and
 Regulation; and
 (G)  the Texas A&M Transportation Institute;
 (2)  at least two representatives from privately owned
 utilities providing electric service, appointed by the director;
 (3)  at least one representative from a publicly owned
 utility providing electric service, appointed by the director;
 (4)  at least one representative from the refueling
 industry with expertise in serving interstate freight
 transportation, appointed by the director; and
 (5)  at least three members from the private sector,
 appointed by the director.
 (c)  The director shall determine the number of
 representatives that each appointing authority under Subsection
 (b) may appoint to serve on the council.
 (d)  A council member serves at the pleasure of the
 appointing authority.
 Sec. 201.683.  TERMS; VACANCY. (a)  Council members serve
 six-year terms.
 (b)  A vacancy on the council shall be filled in the same
 manner as the original appointment.  A council member appointed to
 fill a vacancy on the council shall serve the remainder of the
 unexpired term.
 Sec. 201.684.  PRESIDING OFFICER.  The representative of the
 department appointed under Section 201.682(b)(1) shall serve as the
 presiding officer.
 Sec. 201.685.  MEETINGS.  The council shall meet at least
 once a month or more frequently at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 Sec. 201.686.  ADMINISTRATIVE ATTACHMENT; FUNDING. (a)  The
 council is administratively attached to the department.
 (b)  The council shall be funded using existing funds of the
 department.
 Sec. 201.687.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES.  The council
 shall:
 (1)  provide guidance on policies and incentives that
 encourage the adoption of electric trucks and the proliferation of
 required charging infrastructure;
 (2)  provide guidance on regulatory issues specific to
 electric trucks to ensure that electric trucks maintain safety and
 performance standards;
 (3)  serve as a forum for promoting technological
 advancements in battery technology, electric drivetrains,
 autonomous driving features, and other innovations;
 (4)  facilitate discussions and coordination among
 private entities, governmental entities, and research institutions
 to develop and test new electric truck technologies, share best
 practices, and support industry-wide adoption of those
 technologies and practices; and
 (5)  lead initiatives to educate stakeholders,
 including fleet operators, logistics companies, utilities, and
 policymakers, regarding electric trucks.
 Sec. 201.688.  STATEWIDE STRATEGIC PLAN AND RELATED
 IMPLEMENTATION PLANS. (a) The council shall develop a strategic
 plan for the statewide implementation of electric truck charging
 infrastructure. The plan must:
 (1)  identify strategic locations for electric truck
 charging infrastructure and the requirements for their development
 and construction, including high-capacity power sources, freight
 routes, and the ability to construct operation hubs;
 (2)  specify each agency subject to the plan; and
 (3)  make recommendations for each agency subject to
 the plan relating to the agency's role and responsibilities under
 the plan.
 (b)  The council shall submit the strategic plan to the
 administrative head of each agency subject to the plan.
 (c)  Not later than the 90th day after receiving the
 strategic plan, the administrative head of each agency subject to
 the plan shall develop and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and the legislature a plan for implementing the
 recommendations applicable to the agency under the strategic plan.
 An implementation plan must include a justification for any
 recommendation the agency declines to implement.
 Sec. 201.689.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The council is
 subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  The
 council shall be reviewed during the period in which the department
 is reviewed under Section 201.204.  Unless continued in existence
 as provided by Chapter 325, Government Code, the council is
 abolished and this subchapter expires on the date on which the
 department is subject to abolishment under that section.
 Sec. 201.690.  APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the composition or duration of
 the council or to the designation of the council's presiding
 officer.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than January 31, 2026, the
 appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the members of the
 Electric Truck Advisory Council as required by Section 201.682,
 Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than March 31, 2026, the Electric Truck
 Advisory Council established under Subchapter H-2, Transportation
 Code, as added by this Act, shall hold its initial meeting.
 (c)  Not later than March 1, 2027, the Electric Truck
 Advisory Council shall submit the strategic plan required under
 Section 201.688, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.