Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1030
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2219
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#886
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#886
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1410
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
House
|
01/15/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|