Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1031 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2350 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2350 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2220 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#888 | Journal Page: 2220 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2213 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#888 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2220 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Vote reconsidered in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 01/16/2025 | Filed |