House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 01/16/2025 | Filed |