LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1968
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1968
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1968
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB1968
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2279
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2739
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2803
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
HB3909
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3918
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB4253
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
HB4475
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5115
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB5430
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB1968
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2279
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2739
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2803
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
HB3909
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3918
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB4253
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
HB4475
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5115
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB5430
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted