Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1970 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H No action taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Returned to Calendars Committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs