Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1321 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | RV#214 | Journal Page: 1441 |
House | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1403 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | RV#184 | Journal Page: 1403 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1403 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1399 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#184 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Referred to s/c on Academic & Career-Oriented Education by Speaker | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 02/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 12/23/2024 | Filed |