Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1035
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#892
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2218
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#892
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1837
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|