Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Senate passage reported
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .