Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1883 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#569 | Journal Page: 1883 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1883 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1882 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#520 | Journal Page: 1792 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#520 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amended | 1-Paul | Journal Page: 1791 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#519 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amended 1-Paul | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1380 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 01/24/2025 | Filed |