Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2025
Fiscal Note January 24, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 10, 2025
Analysis April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Bill April 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 21, 2025