House | 05/02/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1008 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Postponed | 5/2/25 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1981 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1981 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Postponed 5/2/25 9:00 AM | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 581 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 581 | |
House | 01/28/2025 | Filed |