Senate | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#390 | Journal Page: 1676 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#390 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1610 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#339 | Journal Page: 1613 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#339 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1621 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Harless | Journal Page: 1608 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#338 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Harless | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 01/28/2025 | Filed |