Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2210 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025 11:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar