Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2084 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#752 | Journal Page: 2083 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2083 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2083 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#660 | Journal Page: 1976 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#660 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed |