Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2270 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 1:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation