House | 05/08/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 591 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 591 | |
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed |