Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2279 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/17/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/17/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars