Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2298 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/06/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
04/03/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted