Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2318 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Considered in Calendars