House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1273 | Journal Page: 2659 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2659 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2658 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1165 | Journal Page: 2525 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1165 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2524 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed |