Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2087 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#755 | Journal Page: 2086 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2086 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#755 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2086 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1983 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#663 | Journal Page: 1979 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1979 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#663 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 599 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed |