Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2379 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/24/2025 10:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 12:41PM