LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2399
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2399
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2399
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/24/2025
2:00 pm
S/C on Family & Fiduciary Relationships Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB809
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB1193
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB1916
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2558
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
HB1973
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
HB2350
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:44PM
HB2399
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2340
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
HB116
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB330
Introduced
Last Action: 03/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB2496
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted