House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/04/2025 | Filed |