House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1637 | Journal Page: 2143 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Postponed | 4/29/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2022 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Postponed 4/29/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |