House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1527 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote RV#1527 | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Postponed | 5/6/25 3:30 PM | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Postponed 5/6/25 3:30 PM | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |