Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2088 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#757 | Journal Page: 2088 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2088 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1986 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#668 | Journal Page: 1985 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#668 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 1984 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#667 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1984 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 1-Canales | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1533 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |