Senate | 05/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#988 | Journal Page: 2353 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#841 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#841 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2172 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2173 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably with amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |