Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2025
Fiscal Note February 5, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 21, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Bill April 21, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 8, 2025