Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1148 | Journal Page: 2502 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2502 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2502 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | Journal Page: 2475 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2475 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1073 | Journal Page: 2384 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 4/30/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2186 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed 4/30/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed |