Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#587 | Journal Page: 1904 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Postponed | 4/25/25 1:15 PM | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Postponed 4/25/25 1:15 PM | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#531 | Journal Page: 1799 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#531 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed |