House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 02/07/2025 | Filed |