Senate | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2498 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1143 | Journal Page: 2498 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2498 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 2440 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1731 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 02/10/2025 | Filed |