Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#391 | Journal Page: 1677 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#391 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1623 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1615 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 1614 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1614 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Guillen | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1433 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 02/12/2025 | Filed |