Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1016
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#871
|
Journal Page: 2205
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#871
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 337
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 337
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|