Senate | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#969 | Journal Page: 2298 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2298 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#821 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1380 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 02/12/2025 | Filed |