House | 05/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 658 | |
House | 02/12/2025 | Filed |