Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2767 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule