Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2815 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)