LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2827
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2827
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2827
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/01/2025
10:30 am
Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB589
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
HB705
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 1:21PM
HB1842
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB1874
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2349
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2614
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB2827
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3012
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3214
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
HB3308
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
HB3385
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB3529
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed