Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2832 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2025
Fiscal Note February 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025
Witness List April 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025