House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1300 | Journal Page: 2683 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2683 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2683 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1194 | Journal Page: 2554 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 339 | |
House | 02/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 339 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |