Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#781 | Journal Page: 2108 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#707 | Journal Page: 2019 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2018 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#707 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 667 | |
House | 02/14/2025 | Filed |