House | 04/28/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1038 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 669 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 669 | |
House | 02/14/2025 | Filed |