LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2891
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2891
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2891
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025
12:00 pm
Energy Resources Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB2766
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2891
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3334
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3791
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3911
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4021
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4041
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB4042
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:27PM
HB4384
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4426
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars