Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB290 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
03/25/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16